This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/02/2022 at 20:58:06 (UTC).

JOHN DOE 12, ET AL. VS DENNIS A. KELLY, M.D, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 JOHN DOE 12, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DENNIS A KELLY, M D,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III and CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9504

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHN DOE 13 #077

JOHN DOE 16 #080

JOHN DOE 15 #079

JOHN DOE 14 #078

JOHN DOE 12 #076

JOHN DOE 17 #081

Defendants

UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KELLY DENNIS A. M.D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILMAN JEFFREY ALAN

Defendant Attorney

TURNER WILLIAM MARLIN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

7/19/2022: Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

7/22/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Unknown - NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT

11/1/2021: Unknown - NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT

11/1/2021: Unknown - NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT

11/1/2021: Unknown - NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT

11/1/2021: Unknown - NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT

11/1/2021: Unknown - NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT

11/1/2021: Unknown - NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/26/2021

7/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/26/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/19/2021

7/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/19/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASE) OF 02/02/2021

2/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASE) OF 02/02/2021

PI General Order

2/2/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASE)

2/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASE)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL ANDREW E. RUBENSTEIN FOR PLAINTIFF JOHN DOE 15

12/29/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL ANDREW E. RUBENSTEIN FOR PLAINTIFF JOHN DOE 15

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Dismissal and Retention of Jurisdiction and Order; Filed by John Doe 12, #076 (Plaintiff); John Doe 13, #077 (Plaintiff); John Doe 14, #078 (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order (eFiling); Filed by John Doe 12, #076 (Plaintiff); John Doe 13, #077 (Plaintiff); John Doe 14, #078 (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Adoption of Master Complaint (for Plaintiff Unique ID No. 078); Filed by John Doe 14, #078 (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Adoption of Master Complaint (for Plaintiff Unique ID No. 081); Filed by John Doe 17, #081 (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Adoption of Master Complaint (for Plaintiff Unique ID No. 080); Filed by John Doe 16, #080 (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Adoption of Master Complaint (for Plaintiff Unique ID No. 077); Filed by John Doe 13, #077 (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Adoption of Master Complaint (for Plaintiff Unique ID No. 076); Filed by John Doe 12, #076 (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Adoption of Master Complaint (for Plaintiff Unique ID No. 079); Filed by John Doe 15, #079 (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by John Doe 12, #076 (Plaintiff); John Doe 13, #077 (Plaintiff); John Doe 14, #078 (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Counsel Andrew E. Rubenstein for Plaintiff John Doe 13); Filed by John Doe 12, #076 (Plaintiff); John Doe 13, #077 (Plaintiff); John Doe 14, #078 (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Counsel Andrew E. Rubenstein for Plaintiff John Doe 12); Filed by John Doe 12, #076 (Plaintiff); John Doe 13, #077 (Plaintiff); John Doe 14, #078 (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by John Doe 12, #076 (Plaintiff); John Doe 13, #077 (Plaintiff); John Doe 14, #078 (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Counsel Andrew E. Rubenstein for Plaintiff John Doe 17); Filed by John Doe 12, #076 (Plaintiff); John Doe 13, #077 (Plaintiff); John Doe 14, #078 (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Counsel Andrew E. Rubenstein for Plaintiff John Doe 14); Filed by John Doe 12, #076 (Plaintiff); John Doe 13, #077 (Plaintiff); John Doe 14, #078 (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by John Doe 12, #076 (Plaintiff); John Doe 13, #077 (Plaintiff); John Doe 14, #078 (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Counsel Andrew E. Rubenstein for Plaintiff John Doe 16); Filed by John Doe 12, #076 (Plaintiff); John Doe 13, #077 (Plaintiff); John Doe 14, #078 (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Counsel Andrew E. Rubenstein for Plaintiff John Doe 15); Filed by John Doe 12, #076 (Plaintiff); John Doe 13, #077 (Plaintiff); John Doe 14, #078 (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less