This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2023 at 20:36:06 (UTC).

JOHN DOE #1 N.L. VS ROE 1, A CALIFORNIA ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 JOHN DOE 1 N L filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ROE 1, A CALIFORNIA ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIHU M. BERLE and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0617

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIHU M. BERLE

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE #1 N.L. JOHN

Defendants

DOES 2 THROUGH 100

ROE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AVEDIAN LILIAN

WEST JAMES

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference)

6/9/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference)

Certificate (name extension) Order Re: In Camera Finding of Reasonable and Meritorious Cause for Filing of Action; Order to Seal and Keep Confidential All Certificates of Merit

5/11/2023: Certificate (name extension) Order Re: In Camera Finding of Reasonable and Meritorious Cause for Filing of Action; Order to Seal and Keep Confidential All Certificates of Merit

Case Management Statement

4/26/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

4/24/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/24/2023

4/24/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/24/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

3/13/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/13/2023

3/13/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/13/2023

Notice of Related Case

3/9/2023: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service as t...)

3/8/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service as t...)

Notice of Related Case

3/8/2023: Notice of Related Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/27/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/27/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

12/29/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

12/29/2022: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Summons Summons on Complaint

12/29/2022: Summons Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/09/2023

DocketMinute Order (Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 06/09/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketOrder Re: In Camera Finding of Reasonable and Meritorious Cause for Filing of Action; Order to Seal and Keep Confidential All Certificates of Merit; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: John Doe #1 N.L. (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/12/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 04/24/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service as to Roe 1 and Roe 2 scheduled for 05/12/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 04/24/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023

DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/24/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023

DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
01/27/2023

DocketUpdated -- James West (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Marc J Bern & Partners LLP to Marc J. Bern & Partners LLP; Middle Name: blank

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023

DocketUpdated -- Roe 1 (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Roe 1, a California entity to Roe 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketComplaint; Filed by: John Doe #1 N.L. (Plaintiff); As to: Roe 1, a California entity (Defendant); DOES 2 through 100 (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: John Doe #1 N.L. (Plaintiff); As to: Roe 1, a California entity (Defendant); DOES 2 through 100 (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: John Doe #1 N.L. (Plaintiff); As to: Roe 1, a California entity (Defendant); DOES 2 through 100 (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Curtis A. Kin in Department 72 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less