*******0706
12/29/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Civil Right - Other Civil Right
Los Angeles, California
THERESA M. TRABER
DOE #1 J.J. JOHN
BOYS & GIRLS CLUBS OF AMERICA
YOUTH & FAMILY CLUB OF POMONA VALLEY
WEST JAMES
FRIEDENTHAL DANIEL R.
5/18/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
5/18/2023: Answer
5/18/2023: Proof of Personal Service
5/18/2023: Proof of Personal Service
5/17/2023: Case Management Statement
4/27/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER:)
4/27/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER:) OF 04/27/2023
4/19/2023: Declaration of Notice - DECLARATION OF NOTICE DECLARATION OF JAMES WEST, ESQ. RE MULTIPLE CONFLICTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES ON MONDAY, MAY 1, 2023 AT 8:30AM, 9:00AM, 10:00AM.
4/19/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
4/19/2023: Case Management Statement
3/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRE...)
2/14/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER:)
2/14/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER:) OF 02/14/2023
12/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference
12/29/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
12/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
12/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
12/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet
Hearing06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference
[-] Read LessHearing06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service
[-] Read LessHearing06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: why the case should not be transferred to the Court's Complex Litigation Program
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: John Doe #1 J.J. (Plaintiff); As to: Boys & Girls Clubs of America (Defendant); Service Date: 04/24/2023; Service Cost: 137.25; Service Cost Waived: No
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: John Doe #1 J.J. (Plaintiff); As to: Youth & Family Club of Pomona Valley (Defendant); Service Date: 04/25/2023; Service Cost: 161.25; Service Cost Waived: No
[-] Read LessDocketAnswer; Filed by: Youth & Family Club of Pomona Valley (Defendant); As to: John Doe #1 J.J. (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Youth & Family Club of Pomona Valley (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: John Doe #1 J.J. (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: why the case should not be transferred to the Court's Complex Litigation Program scheduled for 06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 47
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 47
[-] Read LessDocketUpdated -- John Doe #1 J.J. (Plaintiff): First Name changed from JOHN to John; Last Name changed from DOE #1 J.J. to Doe #1 J.J.
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: JOHN DOE #1 J.J. (Plaintiff); As to: BOYS & GIRLS CLUBS OF AMERICA (Defendant); YOUTH & FAMILY CLUB OF POMONA VALLEY (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JOHN DOE #1 J.J. (Plaintiff); As to: BOYS & GIRLS CLUBS OF AMERICA (Defendant); YOUTH & FAMILY CLUB OF POMONA VALLEY (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JOHN DOE #1 J.J. (Plaintiff); As to: BOYS & GIRLS CLUBS OF AMERICA (Defendant); YOUTH & FAMILY CLUB OF POMONA VALLEY (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Theresa M. Traber in Department 47 Stanley Mosk Courthouse
[-] Read Less