This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2023 at 10:37:52 (UTC).

JOHN DOE #1 J.J. VS BOYS & GIRLS CLUBS OF AMERICA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 JOHN DOE 1 J J filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BOYS GIRLS CLUBS OF AMERICA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THERESA M. TRABER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0706

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THERESA M. TRABER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE #1 J.J. JOHN

Defendants

BOYS & GIRLS CLUBS OF AMERICA

YOUTH & FAMILY CLUB OF POMONA VALLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEST JAMES

Defendant Attorney

FRIEDENTHAL DANIEL R.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/18/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/18/2023: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

5/18/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/18/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

5/17/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER:)

4/27/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER:)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER:) OF 04/27/2023

4/27/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER:) OF 04/27/2023

Declaration of Notice - DECLARATION OF NOTICE DECLARATION OF JAMES WEST, ESQ. RE MULTIPLE CONFLICTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES ON MONDAY, MAY 1, 2023 AT 8:30AM, 9:00AM, 10:00AM.

4/19/2023: Declaration of Notice - DECLARATION OF NOTICE DECLARATION OF JAMES WEST, ESQ. RE MULTIPLE CONFLICTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES ON MONDAY, MAY 1, 2023 AT 8:30AM, 9:00AM, 10:00AM.

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/19/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

4/19/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRE...)

3/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRE...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER:)

2/14/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER:)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER:) OF 02/14/2023

2/14/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER:) OF 02/14/2023

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

12/29/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/02/2023

Hearing06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023

Hearing06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023

Hearing06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: why the case should not be transferred to the Court's Complex Litigation Program

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: John Doe #1 J.J. (Plaintiff); As to: Boys & Girls Clubs of America (Defendant); Service Date: 04/24/2023; Service Cost: 137.25; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: John Doe #1 J.J. (Plaintiff); As to: Youth & Family Club of Pomona Valley (Defendant); Service Date: 04/25/2023; Service Cost: 161.25; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: Youth & Family Club of Pomona Valley (Defendant); As to: John Doe #1 J.J. (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Youth & Family Club of Pomona Valley (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: John Doe #1 J.J. (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: why the case should not be transferred to the Court's Complex Litigation Program scheduled for 06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 47

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 47

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
12/30/2022

DocketUpdated -- John Doe #1 J.J. (Plaintiff): First Name changed from JOHN to John; Last Name changed from DOE #1 J.J. to Doe #1 J.J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2022

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketComplaint; Filed by: JOHN DOE #1 J.J. (Plaintiff); As to: BOYS & GIRLS CLUBS OF AMERICA (Defendant); YOUTH & FAMILY CLUB OF POMONA VALLEY (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JOHN DOE #1 J.J. (Plaintiff); As to: BOYS & GIRLS CLUBS OF AMERICA (Defendant); YOUTH & FAMILY CLUB OF POMONA VALLEY (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JOHN DOE #1 J.J. (Plaintiff); As to: BOYS & GIRLS CLUBS OF AMERICA (Defendant); YOUTH & FAMILY CLUB OF POMONA VALLEY (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Theresa M. Traber in Department 47 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less