This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2023 at 09:48:16 (UTC).

JOHN DOE #1 D.M. VS ROE 1, A CALIFORNIA ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 JOHN DOE 1 D M filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ROE 1, A CALIFORNIA ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0677

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE #1 D.M. JOHN

Defendants

DOES 2 THROUGH 100

ROE 1 A CALIFORNIA ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WEST JAMES

AVEDIAN LILIAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

7/6/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/06/2023

7/6/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/06/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Initial Status Conference)

6/9/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Initial Status Conference)

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case)

5/19/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case)

Case Management Statement

5/15/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Related Case

5/15/2023: Notice of Related Case

Notice (name extension) Notice of Lodging of Documents Being Submitted Conditionally Under Seal

3/1/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Lodging of Documents Being Submitted Conditionally Under Seal

Notice (name extension) Notice Notice of Lodging of Documents Being Submitted Conditionally Under Seal

2/28/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice Notice of Lodging of Documents Being Submitted Conditionally Under Seal

Declaration (name extension) Declaration Certificate of Merit by Mental Health Practitioner

2/27/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration Certificate of Merit by Mental Health Practitioner

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/11/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

12/29/2022: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

12/29/2022: Complaint

Summons Summons on Complaint

12/29/2022: Summons Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

12/29/2022: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Declaration (name extension) Declaration Certificate of Merit by Attorney as to Roe 1

12/29/2022: Declaration (name extension) Declaration Certificate of Merit by Attorney as to Roe 1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/06/2023

DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/06/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketMinute Order (Initial Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 06/09/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketCase numbers 22STCV40662, 22STCV40718, 22STCV40761, 22STCV40619, 22STCV40759, 22STCV40656, 22STCV40785, 22STCV40336, 22STCV40711, 22STCV40677, 22STCV40807, 22STCV40702, 22STCV40772, 22STCV40821, 22STCV40861, 22STCV40700, 22STCV40363, 22STCV40738, 22STCV40333, 22STCV40714, 22STCV40633, 22STCV40389, 22STCV40724, 22STCV40682, 22STCV40836, 22STCV40757, 22STCV40341, 22STCV40803, 22STCV40851, 22STCV40841, 22STCV40628, 22STCV40741, 22STCV40369, 22STCV40338, 22STCV40350, 22STCV40349, 22STCV40695, 22STCV40828, 22STCV40827, 22STCV40660, 22STCV40765, 22STCV40815, 22STCV40778, 22STCV40624, 22STCV40857, 22STCV40344, 22STCV40824, 22STCV40776, 21STCV13750, 22STCV40623, 22STCV40814, 22STCV40793, 22STCV40692, 22STCV40375, 22STCV40837, 22STCV40846, 22STCV40648, 22STCV40694, 22STCV40781, 22STCV40829, 22STCV40967, 22STCV40658, 22STCV40772, 22STCV40710, 22STCV40353, 22STCV40688, 22STCV40757, 22STCV40664, 22STCV40687, 22STCV40666, 22STCV40800, 22STCV40356, 22STCV40753, 22STCV40678, 22STCV40652, 22STCV40715,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 6 - Hon. Elihu M. Berle

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 05/18/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

DocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case: Filed By: JOHN DOE #1 D.M. (Plaintiff); Result: Reviewed - No Action Required ; Result Date: 05/16/2023 ; As To Parties:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
01/11/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketComplaint; Filed by: JOHN DOE #1 D.M. (Plaintiff); As to: ROE 1, a California entity (Defendant); DOES 2 through 100 (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JOHN DOE #1 D.M. (Plaintiff); As to: ROE 1, a California entity (Defendant); DOES 2 through 100 (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketDeclaration Certificate of Merit by Attorney as to Roe 1; Filed by: JOHN DOE #1 D.M. (Plaintiff); As to: ROE 1, a California entity (Defendant); DOES 2 through 100 (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JOHN DOE #1 D.M. (Plaintiff); As to: ROE 1, a California entity (Defendant); DOES 2 through 100 (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mel Red Recana in Department 45 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less