This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2022 at 08:25:52 (UTC).

JOHN DAVID LEWIS, ET AL. VS ASBESTOS COMPANIES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/25/2022 JOHN DAVID LEWIS, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS COMPANIES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7273

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

3M COMPANY

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC.

ASBESTOS COMPANIES

ATWOOD & MORRILL CO. INC. DBA WEIR VALVES AND CONTROLS USA INC.

BORG-WARNER CORPORATION BY ITS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST BORG WARNER MORSE TEC INC.

CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION FKA COOPER CAMERON CORPORATION NAMED AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO COOPER-BESSEMER CORPORATION

CLAYTON INDUSTRIES

CRANE CO

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC.

CUMMINS INC.

DAP INC.

DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY INC.

FMC CORPORATION FKA PEERLESS PUMP CO. INC. FKA CHICAGO PUMP CO. INC. FKA NORTHERN PUMP

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

ITT CORPORATION FKA ITT INDUSTRIES INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SII TO BELL AND GOSSETT

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

ESQ. ALLELI CARINO

FOLEY PATRICK

MARTINOVICH EDWARD

OLSON DEAN ALBERT

PEATMAN STEPHANIE

POND FRANK D.

TAHERI ALEX G

ROBLES KIARA

DAVIS GEOFFREY M.

DUFFY JOSEPH

JACKSON GABRIEL

LOVE MARK A.

KUM ROBERT

KARREN BRENT MARSHALL

MONROE MONICA W

BROSAMLE ANTHONY DEAN

JAMISON KEVIN D.

MICARASET ANDREW

NICHOLS STEPHEN M

Other Attorneys

GOLD ROGER R

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Answer - DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

11/4/2022: Answer - DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Demand for Jury Trial - DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLCS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

11/4/2022: Demand for Jury Trial - DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLCS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

11/4/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Answer - DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES ASBESTOS

11/1/2022: Answer - DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES ASBESTOS

Demand for Jury Trial - DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANYS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

11/1/2022: Demand for Jury Trial - DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANYS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JUSTIN E. GARRATT

10/27/2022: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JUSTIN E. GARRATT

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

10/14/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Substitution of Attorney

10/11/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Answer - DEFENDANT CLAYTON INDUSTRIES ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

9/26/2022: Answer - DEFENDANT CLAYTON INDUSTRIES ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Answer - DEFENDANT CLAYTON INDUSTRIES AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/28/2022: Answer - DEFENDANT CLAYTON INDUSTRIES AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE (LEWIS-22STCV17273))

8/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE (LEWIS-22STCV17273))

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/12/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Case Management Statement

8/15/2022: Case Management Statement

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/17/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/17/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/30/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • Hearing11/29/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDefendant Pneumo Abex LLCs Answer To Plaintiffs Complaint For Damages; Filed by: PNEUMO ABEX LLC, successor in interest to Abex Corporation (Doe 3) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: PNEUMO ABEX LLC, successor in interest to Abex Corporation (Doe 3) (Defendant); As to: PNEUMO ABEX LLC, successor in interest to Abex Corporation (Doe 3) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDefendant Pneumo Abex LLCs Demand For Jury Trial And Estimate Of Length Of Trial; Filed by: PNEUMO ABEX LLC, successor in interest to Abex Corporation (Doe 3) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDefendant Genuine Parts Companys Answer To Plaintiffs Complaint For Damages Asbestos; Filed by: GENUINE PARTS COMPANY aka Napa Auto Parts (Doe 2) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDefendant Genuine Parts Companys Demand For Jury Trial And Estimate Of Length Of Trial; Filed by: GENUINE PARTS COMPANY aka Napa Auto Parts (Doe 2) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance Of Justin E. Garratt; Filed by: Pfizer Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Greene, Tweed & Co. (Defendant); As to: John David Lewis (Plaintiff); Dorothy Rose Lewis (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketAddress for Alleli Carino, Esq. (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Greene, Tweed & Co. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Borg-Warner Corporation by its Successor-in-Interest BORG WARNER MORSE TEC INC. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from BORG-WARNER CORPORATION by its Successor-in-Interest BORG WARNER MORSE TEC INC. to Borg-Warner Corporation by its Successor-in-Interest BORG WARNER MORSE TEC INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Cameron International Corporation (Defendant): Organization Name changed from CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION F/K/A COOPER CAMERON CORPORATION NAMED AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO COOPER-BESSEMER CORPORATION to Cameron International Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Clayton Industries (Defendant): Organization Name changed from CLAYTON INDUSTRIES to Clayton Industries

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Crane Co (Defendant): Organization Name changed from CRANE CO to Crane Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from CROWN, CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. to Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Cummins, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from CUMMINS, INC. to Cummins, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- DAP, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from DAP, INC. to DAP, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Douglass Insulation Company, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC. to Douglass Insulation Company, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- FMC Corporation FKA FKA ., FKA NORTHERN PUMP) (Defendant): Organization Name changed from FMC CORPORATION (FKA PEERLESS PUMP CO., INC. FKA CHICAGO PUMP CO., INC., FKA NORTHERN PUMP) to FMC Corporation FKA FKA ., FKA NORTHERN PUMP)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- FMC Corporation (Defendant): Organization Name changed from FMC Corporation FKA FKA ., FKA NORTHERN PUMP) to FMC Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLAYTON INDUSTRIES is a litigant

Latest cases where DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ATWOOD & MORRILL is a litigant