This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 06:03:23 (UTC).

JOHN CHUNG ET AL VS VISTA HOSPITALITY INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 JOHN CHUNG filed a Contract - Business Governance lawsuit against VISTA HOSPITALITY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0229

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business Governance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

CHUNG SUNG HYUN

CHUNG JOHN

Defendants and Respondents

1901 LA LLC

MAGILINK MANAGEMENT INC.

PARK BENJAMIN DONGSIK

VISTA HOSPITALITY INC.

COLDWELL BANKER WILSHIRE REAL ESTATEDIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PRINCE DAVID L. ESQ.

YOO KENNETH K. ESQ.

LEE FRANK N. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

12/26/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

12/26/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

12/26/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/31/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

RULING RE: DEFENDANT VISTA HOSPITALITY, INC.'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

2/7/2018: RULING RE: DEFENDANT VISTA HOSPITALITY, INC.'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

2/7/2018: Minute Order

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES TO DEFENDANT DONGSIK BENJAMIN PARK (CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ?425.115)

2/23/2018: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES TO DEFENDANT DONGSIK BENJAMIN PARK (CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ?425.115)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

2/23/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Unknown

2/27/2018: Unknown

DEFENDANT RYAN OH AKA CHOON HOON OH; INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA COLD WELL BANKER WILSHIRE REAL ESTATE; RORY REAL ESTATE, INC.; WILSHIRE REAL ESTATE, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT U

2/28/2018: DEFENDANT RYAN OH AKA CHOON HOON OH; INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA COLD WELL BANKER WILSHIRE REAL ESTATE; RORY REAL ESTATE, INC.; WILSHIRE REAL ESTATE, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT U

Minute Order

3/1/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

3/1/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT VISTA HOSPITALITY, INC.

3/12/2018: ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT VISTA HOSPITALITY, INC.

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT

3/14/2018: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT

DEFENDANTS RYAN OH AKA CHOON HOON OH, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA COLD WELL BANKER WILSHIRE REAL FSTATH, RORY REAL ESTATE, INC., AND WILSHIRE REAL ESTATE, INC.?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT;

3/27/2018: DEFENDANTS RYAN OH AKA CHOON HOON OH, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA COLD WELL BANKER WILSHIRE REAL FSTATH, RORY REAL ESTATE, INC., AND WILSHIRE REAL ESTATE, INC.?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT;

RULING RE: DEFENDANTS RYAN OH, RORY REAL ESTATE, INC., AND WILSHIRE REAL ESTATE, INC.'S MOTION TO SET SIDE DEFAULT.

3/27/2018: RULING RE: DEFENDANTS RYAN OH, RORY REAL ESTATE, INC., AND WILSHIRE REAL ESTATE, INC.'S MOTION TO SET SIDE DEFAULT.

Minute Order

3/27/2018: Minute Order

RULING RE: DEFENDANTS RYAN OH, RORY REAL ESTATE, INC., AND WILSHIRE REAL ESTATE, INC.'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT.

4/16/2018: RULING RE: DEFENDANTS RYAN OH, RORY REAL ESTATE, INC., AND WILSHIRE REAL ESTATE, INC.'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT.

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment Pursuant to Order Granting Judgment on the Pleadings); Filed by Benjamin Dongsik Park (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Benjamin Dongsik Park (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketOpposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Default); Filed by Benjamin Dongsik Park (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketJudgment (- Judgment on the Pleading - 05/17/2019 entered for Defendant Park, Benjamin Dongsik against Plaintiff Chung, John.); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketJudgment (Proposed Judgment); Filed by Benjamin Dongsik Park (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketMotion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment; Filed by John Chung (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 61; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
130 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1) CONSTRUCTIVE EVICTION; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by John Chung (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

DAVID L. PRINCE, ESQ., #113599 MILES L. PRINCE, ESQ., #298823 1912 East Vernon Avenue

Suite 100 FILED Los Angeles, California 90058 s“ggflfli\%“{'ng'a?om?m Tel. 323/234-2989 Fax. 323/234-2619 '

DEC 11 2017

Attorney for Defendant, VISTA HOSPITALITY, INC. Sheri R. u; ive Officer/Clark By : Deputy

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT

JOHN CHUNG aka SUNG HYUN CASE NO.: BC680229 - CHUNG, DEFENDANT VISTA HOSPITALITY, INC.’S Plaintiff, REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN

SUPPORT OF THE DEMURRER TO

VS. PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT VISTA HOSPITALITY, INC., etal., DATE: February 7, 2018 TIME: 9:00 a.m.

Defendants. DEPT: 61

C.R.S. Reservation No. 171201271004

Pursuant to Evidence Code Sections 451 and 452 and in support of its demurrer, filed concurrently Defendant, Vista Hospitality, Inc., hereby requests judicial notice of: Exhibit A: Declaration of Anna Chung Supporting Judgment by Court Following Default. Exhibit B: Order on Plaintiff’s Motion for Summary Judgment on Nondischargeability Exhibit C: Judgment of Nondischargeability

~ Exhibit D: Judgment by Court After Default . DATED: December 7, 2017 - MILES L. PRINCE,

Attorney for Defendant Vista Hospitality, Inc.

1 Defendant Vista Hospitality, Inc.’s Demurrer to Plaintiff’s Complaint

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VISTA HOSPITALITY INC. A TEXAS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where COLDWELL BANKER MALIBU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOO KENNETH K.