This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2022 at 15:11:15 (UTC).

JOHN CHRISTOPHER LAURICELLA, JR. TRUST NO. 1 DATED 12/29/2008

Case Summary

On 03/29/2022 JOHN CHRISTOPHER LAURICELLA, JR TRUST NO 1 DATED 12/29/2008 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3033

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

LAURICELLA ELLEN C.

LAURICELLA J. CHRISTOPHER

Not Classified By Court

JOHN CHRISTOPHER LAURICELLA JR. TRUST NO. 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CARICO CHRISTOPHER DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Declaration - RE Notice Of Ex Parte Petition For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem

3/29/2022: Declaration - RE Notice Of Ex Parte Petition For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem

Ex Parte - Application - (DROP OFF) Petition For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem

3/29/2022: Ex Parte - Application - (DROP OFF) Petition For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem

Ex Parte - Order

4/1/2022: Ex Parte - Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketEx Parte - Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketEx Parte - Application ((DROP OFF) Petition For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (RE Notice Of Ex Parte Petition For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARICO CHRISTOPHER DANIEL