Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2021 at 19:08:03 (UTC).

JOHN BUDDE VS STEPHAN KEE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 JOHN BUDDE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STEPHAN KEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4351

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUDDE JOHN

Defendants

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES LLC

KEE STEPHAN

EAN HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOREY CHRISTOPHER J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

4/29/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/15/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2024
  • Hearing04/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • Hearing10/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • Hearing09/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by John Budde (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by John Budde (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by John Budde (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOREY CHRISTOPHER JOHN