This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 19:12:36 (UTC).

JOHN BANKS VS PETSMART, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 JOHN BANKS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PETSMART, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9759

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANKS JOHN

Defendant

PETSMART LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN TIMOTHY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/28/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/9/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2024
  • Hearing10/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • Hearing04/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • Hearing04/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by John Banks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by John Banks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by John Banks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by John Banks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC COAST DISTRIBUTING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN TIMOTHY