This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 12:47:39 (UTC).

JOHN BALDING VS MESROP AYVAZYAN

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 JOHN BALDING filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MESROP AYVAZYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8881

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BALDING JOHN

Defendant

AYVAZYAN MESROP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZEESMAN ALEXANDER JOSHUA

ZEESMAN DIANA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/5/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

8/13/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

8/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/24/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2024
  • Hearing08/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • Hearing02/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • Hearing01/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by John Balding (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by John Balding (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by John Balding (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by John Balding (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEESMAN DIANA