This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2023 at 13:40:44 (UTC).

JOHN ANTHONY FERRY VS BROTMAN MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 JOHN ANTHONY FERRY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BROTMAN MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH, MICHAEL E. WHITAKER, JILL FEENEY, ELAINE LU and CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8556

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

JILL FEENEY

ELAINE LU

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERRY JOHN ANTHONY

Defendants

BROTMAN MEDICAL CENTER

PROSPECT MEDICAL GROUP INC

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL CULVER CITY

PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS INC.

BIJANPOUR KAMAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM DBA SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL AT CULVER CITY

Respondent and Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL CULVER CITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SADEGHIBAHARI SOHEIL L. II ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

BROWN EDWIN B

WETKOWSKI MELISSA MARIE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

9/30/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

8/31/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

7/13/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

7/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

7/12/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

7/12/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Notice of Change of Firm Name

5/31/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Ruling

2/10/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND EXPERT ...)

2/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND EXPERT ...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND EXPERT DISCOVERY

2/8/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND EXPERT DISCOVERY

Notice of Ruling

12/6/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (COURT SPECIALLY SET))

12/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (COURT SPECIALLY SET))

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO.1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE NOT TIMELY DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY;

11/23/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO.1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE NOT TIMELY DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY;

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY CONCERNING THE REASON BEHIND PLAINITFFS ADMISSION AT THE HOSPITAL AND HIS CONDUCT AND BEHAVIOR TOWARD HIMSELF AND OTHERS WHIL

11/23/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY CONCERNING THE REASON BEHIND PLAINITFFS ADMISSION AT THE HOSPITAL AND HIS CONDUCT AND BEHAVIOR TOWARD HIMSELF AND OTHERS WHIL

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO.4 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANTS ACCOMPLISHMENTS, AWARDS, ACCOLADES, ETC.

11/23/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO.4 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANTS ACCOMPLISHMENTS, AWARDS, ACCOLADES, ETC.

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY CONCERNING PLAINTIFFS BEHAVIOR AND CONDUCT PRIOR AND SUBSEQUENT TO BEING HOSPITALIZED

11/23/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY CONCERNING PLAINTIFFS BEHAVIOR AND CONDUCT PRIOR AND SUBSEQUENT TO BEING HOSPITALIZED

Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFONRIA HOSPITAL AT CULVER CITYS NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER TO DEFENDANT KAMAL BIJIANPOUR, M.D.S MOTION TO STAY ACTION

11/23/2021: Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFONRIA HOSPITAL AT CULVER CITYS NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER TO DEFENDANT KAMAL BIJIANPOUR, M.D.S MOTION TO STAY ACTION

133 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/30/2022

DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. (Defendant); Southern California Healthcare System, (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2022

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 09/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/02/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2022

DocketJury Trial (5 yr. date extended to 11-21-22) - NFC scheduled for 09/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/02/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2022

DocketOn the Complaint filed by JOHN ANTHONY FERRY on 01/31/2017, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by John Anthony Ferry as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2022

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: John Anthony Ferry (Plaintiff); As to: Brotman Medical Center (Defendant); Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. (Defendant); Southern California Healthcare System, (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2022

DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial: Filed By: Southern California Healthcare System, (Defendant),Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/13/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2022

DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Brotman Medical Center (Defendant); Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. (Defendant); Southern California Healthcare System, (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2022

DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2022

DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial scheduled for 07/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 updated: Result Date to 07/13/2022; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2022

DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Final Status Conference scheduled for 07/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 09/07/2022 10:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
245 More Docket Entries
05/04/2017

DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2017

DocketDocument:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2017

DocketDocument:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2017

DocketDocument:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2017

DocketDocument:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2017

DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2017

DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 01/31/20 at 8:30 am Benny C. Osorio

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2017

DocketCase Filed/Opened:Other PI/PD/WD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2017

DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2017

DocketDocument:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: ****8556 Hearing Date: December 1, 2021 Dept: 32

PLEASE NOTE: Parties are encouraged to meet and confer concerning this tentative ruling to determine if a resolution may be reached. If the parties are unable to reach a resolution and a party intends to submit on this tentative ruling, the party must send an email to the Court at sscdept32@lacourt.org indicating that party’s intention to submit. The email shall include the case number, date and time of the hearing, counsel’s contact information (if applicable), and the identity of the party submitting on this tentative ruling. If the Court does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on this tentative ruling and there are no appearances at the hearing, the Court may place the motion off calendar. If all parties do not submit on this tentative ruling, they should arrange to appear in-person or remotely (which is highly encouraged). Further, after the Court has posted/issued a tentative ruling, the Court has the inherent authority to prohibit the withdrawal of the subject motion and adopt the tentative ruling as the order of the Court.

TENTATIVE RULING

DEPARTMENT

32

HEARING DATE

December 1, 2021

CASE NUMBER

****8556

MOTION

Motion for Stay of Proceedings

MOVING PARTY

Defendant Kamal Bijanpour, M.D.

OPPOSING PARTY

Plaintiff John Anthony Ferry

MOTION

Plaintiff John Anthony Ferry sued Defendant Kamal Bijanpour, M.D. (“Bijanpour”) based on injuries Plaintiff alleges he sustained as a patient under the care of Defendant Southern California Healthcare System, Inc., doing business as Southern California Hospital at Culver City (“Hospital”), when another patient attacked Plaintiff while Plaintiff was under four-point restraints, as ordered by Bijanpour. Bijanpour has pleaded guilty in an unrelated federal criminal matter, and now moves for a stay of proceedings pending the completion of his 18-month sentence in a federal penal institution. Hospital joins Bijanpour’s motion to stay the action. Plaintiff opposes the motion.

ANALYSIS

“[W]hen the trial court determines on motion that the in-court testimony of a prisoner defendant – whether indigent or not – is needed to protect the due process of the parties, it may attempt, through the Department of Corrections, to arrange the presence of the prisoner. Except in a few specified circumstances, a court has no statutory authority to command the Department of Corrections to transport a prisoner to a civil courtroom. But judges do a have a constitutional duty to uphold the due process clause. Accordingly, if a court determines that a prisoner’s personal testimony is needed to preserve due process rights, but the Department of Corrections refuses accommodation, the court may order a continuance or employ other alternatives to transporting the prisoner, such as recording his testimony or if feasible holding a portion of the trial at the prison.” (Payne v Superior Court (1976) 17 Cal.3d 908, 924-925.)

In Payne, the California Supreme Court considered various means of upholding a prisoner’s rights under the due process and equal protection clauses of both the state and federal constitutions when the prisoner faces a simultaneous civil suit. (See Payne, supra, 17 Cal.3d at pp. 922-923.) The Payne court found “the dual deprivation of appointed counsel and the right to personal presence in court is unconstitutional, but not that the denial of each of those rights individually is invalid. Indeed, to grant [an indigent prisoner] an absolute right to both appointed counsel and personal appearance would achieve the anomalous result of according him greater privileges than those possessed by an ordinary civil litigant.” (Id. at p. 923.) In such situations, one alternative “is to require trial courts to defer trial of actions against prisoners until their release. When this course of action is not prohibited by law (see, e.g., Code Civ. Proc., ; 1054) and postponement will not substantially prejudice the rights of plaintiffs, trial courts may exercise their discretion in this manner.” (Ibid.)

Here, Bijanpour asserts he must be allowed to testify at trial that he was not present at the hospital on the date of Plaintiff’s injury and his only involvement with Plaintiff was to order medication for Plaintiff and Plaintiff be restrained after throwing items at hospital staff and threatening doctors. Bijanpour represents his incarceration is set to begin on December 1, 2021, and will prevent him from attending trial in this matter until late 2022.

In opposition, Plaintiff argues staying this action for a year or more will significantly prejudice Plaintiff as the case will reach the statutory five-year limit for bringing a case to trial on January 31, 2022.[1] Plaintiff also suggests Bijanpour may attend trial via video conference technology if it is available at the detention facility.

The Court finds Bijanpour has not adequately demonstrated that no feasible alternatives exist to uphold Bijanpour’s due process rights at trial. Bijanpour has not shown that his appearance at trial cannot be arranged either in person or virtually through the Federal Bureau of Prisons especially when it is uncertain where he will be incarcerated, or that a recording of his testimony will not suffice. Further, in light of the pending five-year limit to bring Plaintiff’s case to trial, the Court finds the requested stay will prejudice Plaintiff absent a showing Bijanpour has no reasonable alternatives for presenting his testimony at trial.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Therefore, the Court denies Bijanpour’s motion for a stay of proceedings until late 2022. However, in light of the impending trial of December 15, 2021, the Court will grant a short continuance of the trial to permit Bijanpour or any other party to determine whether Bijanpour may appear at trial in person or remotely, despite being incarcerated, through the Federal Bureau of Prisons, or whether Bijanpour’s testimony may be recorded by deposition after he is set to start his federal prison term on December 1, 2021.

As such, the Court continues the trial to March 1, 2022 at 8:30 A.M. in Department 32, and continues the Final Status Conference to February 15, 2022 at 10:00 A.M. in Department 32. All discovery shall remain closed, and the pre-trial motion cut off remains in effect except for any motions to continue the trial or to stay proceedings.

Bijanpour shall provide notice of this order and file a proof of service of such.


[1] The Court notes that the date of January 31, 2022 is incorrect. As set forth in the Minute Order of August 24, 2020, the Court calculated the 5-year deadline under Code of Civil Procedure section 583.310 as November 21, 2022.

'


Case Number: ****8556    Hearing Date: May 27, 2021    Dept: 32

PLEASE NOTE: Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept32@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear in-person or remotely.

TENTATIVE RULING

DEPARTMENT

32

HEARING DATE

May 27, 2021

CASE NUMBER

****8556

MOTION

Motion to Continue Trial Date

MOVING PARTY

Defendant Kamal Bijanpour

OPPOSING PARTY

None

MOTION

Defendant Kamal Bijanpour (“Defendant”) moves to continue the trial in this matter, which is currently set for July 9, 2021, to September 9, 2021. All parties have stipulated to the continuance.

ANALYSIS

“Continuances are granted only on an affirmative showing of good cause requiring a continuance.”  (In re Marriage of Falcone and Fyke (2008) 164 Cal.App.4th 814, 823.)  A trial court has broad discretion in considering a request for a trial continuance.  (Pham v. Nguyen (1997) 54 Cal.App.4th 11, 13-18.)  California Rules of Court, rule 3.1332 sets forth factors for the Court to consider in ruling on a motion to continue trial.

Defendant seeks a continuance of trial because Defendant’s counsel will be out of state on the current trial date. This is good cause for a trial continuance. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1332, subd. (c)(3).) The trial date, currently set for July 9, 2021, is advanced to this date, and continued to September 9, 2021 at 8:30 AM. The final status conference, currently set for June 25, 2021, is advanced to this date, and continued to August 26, 2021 at 10:00 AM.

In addition, the Court orders that all of the discovery and motion cut-off dates shall be based upon the July 9, 2021 trial date. Defendant is to give notice of this order, and file a proof of service of such.