Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:33:34 (UTC).

JOHN ALMIRALL VS SPECIALIZED ELEVATOR CORP ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/07/2017 JOHN ALMIRALL filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against SPECIALIZED ELEVATOR CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2574

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ALMIRALL JOHN

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SPECIALIZED ELEVATOR CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 50

JONES LANG LASALLE AMERICAS INC.

RODEO WILSHIRE REALTY INC.

RMC FACILITIES SERVICES INC.

RMC FACILITITES SERVICES INC.

WILROAD ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

TREA WILSHIRE RODEO LLC DOE 6

RMC CONSTRUCTION

A&R DRYWALL SERVICE INC.

WILFROAD ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Plaintiff, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

STEINER NEIL S. ESQ.

AREVALO ERIC

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

COX SCOTT A. ESQ.

SANTA ROMANA MARK V.

YEE STEVEN ROBERT

HIRSCH MICHAEL

PAOLUCCI KRISTEN K

COX SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Answer

7/1/2019: Answer

Minute Order

7/1/2019: Minute Order

Answer

7/5/2019: Answer

Answer

7/5/2019: Answer

Reply

7/22/2019: Reply

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/23/2019: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

8/14/2019: Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service

9/18/2018: Proof of Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/25/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/28/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

1/8/2019: Answer

Notice of Deposit - Jury

2/5/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Demand for Jury Trial

2/5/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice

2/8/2019: Notice

Cross-Complaint

3/28/2019: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/19/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Cross-Complaint

5/21/2019: Cross-Complaint

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

11/7/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Ruling on Defendant/Cross-Defendant/Cross-Complainant, Bank of America, N.A.'s Motion for Leave to File First Amended Cross-Complaint); Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend (Motion for Leave to Amend Bank of America's Cross-Complaint) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Motion for Leave to Amen...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by RODEO WILSHIRE REALTY, INC. (Cross-Complainant); WILROAD ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Cross-Complainant); Wilroad Associates Limited Partnership (Cross-Complainant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by RODEO WILSHIRE REALTY, INC. (Cross-Complainant); WILROAD ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Cross-Complainant); Wilroad Associates Limited Partnership (Cross-Complainant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketCROSS-COM PLAINT FOR INDEMNITY, PARTIAL INDEMNIFICATION AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by SPECIALIZED ELEVATOR CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SPECIALIZED ELEVATOR CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by JOHN ALMIRALL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by JOHN ALMIRALL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JOHN ALMIRALL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC682574    Hearing Date: July 10, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

JOHN ALMIRALL,

Plaintiff,

v.

SPECIALIZED ELEVATOR CORP., ET AL.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC682574

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 31 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE WEST DISTRICT, JUDGE H. JAY FORD III presiding in DEPT. WE-O of the SANTA MONICA Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: July 10, 2020 ___________________________

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPECIALIZED ELEVATOR CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where JONES LANG LASALLE AMERICAS, INC., A MARYLAND CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEINER NEIL STUART