Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/18/2021 at 02:41:01 (UTC).

JOHN A. DEFRATE, ET AL. VS DANIEL JAEHEE LEE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 JOHN A DEFRATE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DANIEL JAEHEE LEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3869

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DEFRATE MARIE LAURE B.

DEFRATE JOHN A.

Defendants

EDREAMS INC.

LEE DANIEL JAEHEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PAULY ANDREW S

Other Attorneys

SUSSMAN MITCHELL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/1/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

2/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/4/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/22/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Answer

2/5/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

12/21/2020: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

12/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/16/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

11/17/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/17/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by JOHN A. DEFRATE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by eDreams, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JOHN A. DEFRATE (Plaintiff); MARIE LAURE B. DEFRATE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by JOHN A. DEFRATE (Plaintiff); MARIE LAURE B. DEFRATE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by JOHN A. DEFRATE (Plaintiff); MARIE LAURE B. DEFRATE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JOHN A. DEFRATE (Plaintiff); MARIE LAURE B. DEFRATE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JOHN A. DEFRATE (Plaintiff); MARIE LAURE B. DEFRATE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Errata); Filed by JOHN A. DEFRATE (Plaintiff); MARIE LAURE B. DEFRATE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOHN A. DEFRATE (Plaintiff); MARIE LAURE B. DEFRATE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JOHN A. DEFRATE (Plaintiff); MARIE LAURE B. DEFRATE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JOHN A. DEFRATE (Plaintiff); MARIE LAURE B. DEFRATE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUSSMAN MITCHELL