This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2023 at 13:22:22 (UTC).

JOHANNA STONE VS RSI ENTERPRISES, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 JOHANNA STONE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RSI ENTERPRISES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4362

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STONE JOHANNA

Defendant

RSI ENTERPRISES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARDONA-LOYA II OCTAVIO

Defendant Attorney

SORENSEN WENDI A

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/6/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/6/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/6/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Other - - Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

2/14/2019: Other - - Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

2/14/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

Proof of Personal Service

2/27/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

7/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/16/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JULY 22, 2020) OF 07/15/2020

7/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JULY 22, 2020) OF 07/15/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JULY 22, 2020)

7/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JULY 22, 2020)

Answer

7/9/2019: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...)

6/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...) OF 06/11/2021

6/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...) OF 06/11/2021

Notice of Settlement

6/11/2021: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

8/12/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/12/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Johanna Stone on 02/06/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Johanna Stone as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Johanna Stone (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire...) of 06/11/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 06/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 06/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Jury Trial scheduled for 06/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 06/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 06/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketStanding Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch in Department 5 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Johanna Stone (Plaintiff); As to: RSI Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Johanna Stone (Plaintiff); As to: RSI Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Johanna Stone (Plaintiff); As to: RSI Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less