This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/09/2023 at 10:19:12 (UTC).

JOHANNA MEZA VS DEEGAN EXPRESS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2022 JOHANNA MEZA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DEEGAN EXPRESS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY J. FUJIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2785

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY J. FUJIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEZA JOHANNA

Defendants

DEEGAN ALLISON

DEEGAN EXPRESS

DEEGAN RITA

DEEGAN WILLIAM

ENGLISH REGINA

RATHMOR SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RABBAN MATTHEW

Defendant Attorney

RHODES ELIZABETH D.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/2/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/02/2023

2/2/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/02/2023

Case Management Statement

1/19/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/9/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANTS DEEGAN EXPRESS, RATHMOR SERVICES, WILLIAM DEEGAN, RITA DEEGAN, ALLISON DEEGAN, AND REGINA ENGLISHS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF JOHANNA MEZAS COMPLAINT

12/5/2022: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANTS DEEGAN EXPRESS, RATHMOR SERVICES, WILLIAM DEEGAN, RITA DEEGAN, ALLISON DEEGAN, AND REGINA ENGLISHS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF JOHANNA MEZAS COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/21/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/2/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/26/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/26/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/6/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/6/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/6/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Complaint

10/6/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/6/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2024
  • Hearing05/20/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2024
  • Hearing05/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/20/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 02/02/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 02/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Deegan Express (Defendant); Rathmor Services (Defendant); William Deegan (Defendant); Rita Deegan (Defendant); Allison Deegan (Defendant); Regina English (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 01/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 01/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Johanna Meza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Holly J. Fujie in Department 56 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketAddress for Matthew Rabban (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Johanna Meza (Plaintiff); As to: Deegan Express (Defendant); Rathmor Services (Defendant); William Deegan (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Johanna Meza (Plaintiff); As to: Deegan Express (Defendant); Rathmor Services (Defendant); William Deegan (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Johanna Meza (Plaintiff); As to: Deegan Express (Defendant); Rathmor Services (Defendant); William Deegan (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less