Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2021 at 21:51:19 (UTC).

JOEL PULGARIN VS KENDALL HEURKINS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 JOEL PULGARIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KENDALL HEURKINS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6593

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PULGARIN JOEL

Defendants

HEURKINS HOLLY

HEURKINS KENDALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ABIRI ROBERT

CUSTODIO MIGUEL ANGEL

Defendant Attorneys

MICHAEL CHRISTINA F.

KIM BENJAMIN

MICHAEL CHRISTINA FERRERI

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

5/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

5/20/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

5/20/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM

3/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM

2/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM

Answer

2/8/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/8/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

1/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

1/11/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/4/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/4/2020: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2023
  • Hearing12/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • Hearing06/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Hearing05/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Hearing09/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Hearing09/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Joel Pulgarin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion (FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS;); Filed by Kendall Heurkins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion (FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS;); Filed by Kendall Heurkins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Change of Handling Attorney within Firm); Filed by Kendall Heurkins (Defendant); Holly Heurkins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Change of Handling Attorney within Firm); Filed by Kendall Heurkins (Defendant); Holly Heurkins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kendall Heurkins (Defendant); Holly Heurkins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Kendall Heurkins (Defendant); Holly Heurkins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joel Pulgarin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Joel Pulgarin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joel Pulgarin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABIRI ROBERT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUSTODIO MIGUEL A.