This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/10/2019 at 10:30:56 (UTC).

JOEL NAKABAYASHI VS TWO BRUDDAHS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/14/2018 JOEL NAKABAYASHI filed an Other lawsuit against TWO BRUDDAHS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BARBARA A. MEIERS and JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4894

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARBARA A. MEIERS

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAKABAYASHI JOEL

Defendants

TWO BRUDDAHS INC.

CHANG NAKABAYASHI SHAKAS HANG LOOSE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CHANG FUN S.

UPTOWN KOOP LLC

ZAPIEN MIGUEL

CHANG WILSON

HANG LOOSE INC.

CHANG NAKABAYASHI DBA SHAKAS

TWO BRUDDAHS INC. DBA SHAKAS HAWAIIAN FLAVORS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHANG DENNIS WENDELL

CHANG DENNIS WENDELL ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT MIGUEL ZAPIEN

9/3/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT MIGUEL ZAPIEN

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY PLAINTIFF JOE...) OF 06/27/2019

6/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY PLAINTIFF JOE...) OF 06/27/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY PLAINTIFF JOE...)

6/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY PLAINTIFF JOE...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY...)

6/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY...)

Answer - ANSWER AMENDED

4/18/2019: Answer - ANSWER AMENDED

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 04/02/2019

4/2/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 04/02/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/2/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Proof of Service by Mail

3/27/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

3/18/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application Ex Parte App for TRO and OSC

2/14/2019: Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application Ex Parte App for TRO and OSC

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

2/7/2019: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

2/7/2019: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction)

1/31/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction)

Motion for Preliminary Injunction

1/2/2019: Motion for Preliminary Injunction

Complaint

11/14/2018: Complaint

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Joel Nakabayashi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 10/09/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Production of Documents (Zapien)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (deposition) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Production of Documents (Chang)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketOrder (Granting Motion to Compel Miguel Zapien to Produce Documents and for Sanctions); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketOrder (Granting Motion to Compel Wilson Chang to Produce Documents and for Sanctions); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketMotion for Preliminary Injunction; Filed by Joel Nakabayashi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Joel Nakabayashi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Joel Nakabayashi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joel Nakabayashi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joel Nakabayashi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TWO BRUDDAHS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANG DENNIS WENDELL