This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2022 at 16:55:11 (UTC).

JOEL LAZARO, ET AL. VS QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 JOEL LAZARO filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN J. KRALIK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0434

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN J. KRALIK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAZARO JOEL

LAZARO ROSEMARIE

Defendants

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION A BUSINESS ENTITY

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC A BUSINESS ENTITY

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON A BUSINESS ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAPERO SARAH

Defendant Attorney

STEVENSON RICHARD LEE

 

Court Documents

Declaration - QUALITY'S DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS

7/21/2022: Declaration - QUALITY'S DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS

Notice - NOTICE OF QUALITY'S DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS

7/21/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF QUALITY'S DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS

Proof of Service by Mail

7/21/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS J. RAAB IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, LLC"S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

7/1/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS J. RAAB IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, LLC"S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

7/1/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Proof of Service by Mail

7/1/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

7/1/2022: Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/8/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT SPECIALIAZED LOAN SERVICING LLCS OPPOSITION TO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

7/8/2022: Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT SPECIALIAZED LOAN SERVICING LLCS OPPOSITION TO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Order - COURT'S ORDER RE: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

7/15/2022: Order - COURT'S ORDER RE: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY PLAINTI...)

7/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY PLAINTI...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD...)

6/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROSEMARIE LAZARO IN SUPPORT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

6/20/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROSEMARIE LAZARO IN SUPPORT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

6/20/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/20/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion for Preliminary Injunction

6/20/2022: Motion for Preliminary Injunction

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

6/16/2022: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO RESTRAIN THE RECORDING OF FORECLOSURE RELATED DOCUMENTS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS PROPERTY

6/16/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO RESTRAIN THE RECORDING OF FORECLOSURE RELATED DOCUMENTS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS PROPERTY

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • Hearing11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • Hearing08/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION, a business entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketQuality's Declaration of Non-Monetary Status; Filed by QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION, a business entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Quality's Declaration of Non-Monetary Status); Filed by QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION, a business entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B, John J. Kralik, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Filed by Plaintiffs, Rosemarie Lazaro and Joel Lazaro on 06/20/2022) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCourt's Order re: Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed by Plainti...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by JOEL LAZARO (Plaintiff); ROSEMARIE LAZARO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketReply (TO DEFENDANT SPECIALIAZED LOAN SERVICING LLCS OPPOSITION TO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION); Filed by JOEL LAZARO (Plaintiff); ROSEMARIE LAZARO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by JOEL LAZARO (Plaintiff); ROSEMARIE LAZARO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEx Parte Application (FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO RESTRAIN THE RECORDING OF FORECLOSURE RELATED DOCUMENTS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS PROPERTY); Filed by JOEL LAZARO (Plaintiff); ROSEMARIE LAZARO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by JOEL LAZARO (Plaintiff); ROSEMARIE LAZARO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOEL LAZARO (Plaintiff); ROSEMARIE LAZARO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JOEL LAZARO (Plaintiff); ROSEMARIE LAZARO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (Addendum); Filed by JOEL LAZARO (Plaintiff); ROSEMARIE LAZARO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JOEL LAZARO (Plaintiff); ROSEMARIE LAZARO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Quality Loan Service Corporation is a litigant