This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2022 at 11:49:42 (UTC).

JOEL LABI VS AIRBNB, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 JOEL LABI filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against AIRBNB, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5500

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LABI JOEL

Defendants

HARTLEY THEA

AIRBNB INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLEIN ROBERT MAX

Defendant Attorney

HAMMACK WAYNE H.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/11/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

3/1/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Answer

1/18/2022: Answer

Request for Dismissal

1/7/2022: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/29/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

9/2/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

6/15/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE ...)

6/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE ...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES PURSUANT TO THE STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES

6/10/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES PURSUANT TO THE STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Joel Labi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Continue the Trial Date and All Related Dates and Deadlines Pursuant to the Stipulation of the Parties) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Continue the ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for an Order to Continue the Trial Date and All Related Dates and Deadlines Pursuant to the Stipulation of the Parties); Filed by Thea Hartley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Thea Hartley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Joel Labi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Joel Labi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Joel Labi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joel Labi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joel Labi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Joel Labi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIRBNB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAMMACK WAYNE HOWARD