This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2022 at 17:38:09 (UTC).

JOEL ALVARADO, ET AL. VS DANIEL CORTEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 JOEL ALVARADO, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DANIEL CORTEZ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRA MORI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5499

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALVARADO JOEL

ALVARADO KAREN

Defendants

CORTEZ DANIEL

CORTEZ GEMY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHULJYAN ABRAHAM

Defendant Attorney

TUSA DANIEL P.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/16/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/30/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

9/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

9/29/2020: PI General Order

Answer

10/29/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

10/29/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 03/02/2022

3/2/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 03/02/2022

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/18/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/18/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Change of Firm Name

6/22/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Request for Dismissal

3/9/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

3/4/2022: Notice of Settlement

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Joel Alvarado (Plaintiff); Karen Alvarado (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Joel Alvarado (Plaintiff); Karen Alvarado (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Joel Alvarado (Plaintiff); Karen Alvarado (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Joel Alvarado (Plaintiff); Karen Alvarado (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joel Alvarado (Plaintiff); Karen Alvarado (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joel Alvarado (Plaintiff); Karen Alvarado (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joel Alvarado (Plaintiff); Karen Alvarado (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Joel Alvarado (Plaintiff); Karen Alvarado (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Joel Alvarado (Plaintiff); Karen Alvarado (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joel Alvarado (Plaintiff); Karen Alvarado (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHULJYAN ABRAHAM