This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2021 at 08:29:17 (UTC).

JOE ANGEL SEDENO, JR. VS URGENT.LY INC.

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 JOE ANGEL SEDENO, JR filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against URGENT LY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2092

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEDENO JOE ANGEL JR.

Defendant

URGENT.LY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEBE JONATHAN M.

Defendant Attorneys

BERNARD CHAD D.

CEPEDA DANIELLE CAROLINE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/30/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 04/12/2021

4/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 04/12/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

4/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Order - ORDER CASE ANYWHERE

6/18/2021: Order - ORDER CASE ANYWHERE

Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

6/14/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

6/8/2021: Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE

6/8/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE

Notice of Appearance

6/7/2021: Notice of Appearance

Answer - DEFENDANT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

7/19/2021: Answer - DEFENDANT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • Hearing10/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDefendant Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended class action complaint; Filed by Urgent.ly Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • Docketat 4:30 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReLACC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketOrder (Case Anywhere); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketJoint Initial Status Conference Statement; Filed by Joe Angel Sedeno, Jr. (Plaintiff); Urgent.ly Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Class and Representative Action Complaint; Filed by Joe Angel Sedeno, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Joe Angel Sedeno, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Urgent.ly Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docketat 3:18 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) of 04/12/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Joe Angel Sedeno, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joe Angel Sedeno, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joe Angel Sedeno, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERNARD, CHAD D.