This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 22:35:42 (UTC).

JOE A GRINIE VS CITY OF ALHAMBRA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 JOE A GRINIE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CITY OF ALHAMBRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2668

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRINIE JOE A

Defendants

R. RONGAVILLA ID 128

E. TAMAYO ID 225

DETECTIVE CASTILLO ID 134

B. CHUNG ID 281

DETECTIVE JESUS ROMERO

CITY OF ALHAMBRA

CARDELLA

SARGEANT S. CARR ID 124

JACKIE LACEY DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

DETECTIVE J. QUINONES ID 196

NORMA SERNA DEPUTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

Z. MCFARLAND ID 282

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

T. SEKI ID 220

ALHAMBRA POLICE DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIS KAYRETHA HALE

Defendant Attorneys

MONTES JOSEPH MICHAEL

INLOW LAURA ECKERLIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/28/2019: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/28/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/28/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/28/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/28/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Status Conference and Order

7/2/2019: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Proof of Personal Service

8/19/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/19/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/19/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

9/6/2019: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/13/2019

9/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/13/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

8/19/2019: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE REMAND FROM FEDERAL COURT)

12/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE REMAND FROM FEDERAL COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE REMAND FROM FEDERAL COURT) OF 12/26/2019

12/26/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE REMAND FROM FEDERAL COURT) OF 12/26/2019

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (re Remand from Federal Court) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Remand from Federal Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re Remand from Federal Court) of 12/26/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Initial Status Conference (and proof of service as to all parties.**Off/Cal- Removal filed**) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Docketat 2:48 PM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/13/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant); Jackie Lacey District Attorney of the County of Los Angeles (Defendant); Norma Serna Deputy District Attorney (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Joe A Grinie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by City of Alhambra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Joe A Grinie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Joe A Grinie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joe A Grinie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joe A Grinie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joe A Grinie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Joe A Grinie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cardella is a litigant

Latest cases where Alhambra Police Department is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF ALHAMBRA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIS, KAYRETHA H