This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2019 at 07:59:14 (UTC).

JODY NOOGER VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT IN

Case Summary

On 06/12/2018 JODY NOOGER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT IN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9904

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NOOGER JODY

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

CORTES EDWIN

CORTES AGUENDA

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA REAL ESTATE

DOES 1-100

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA REAL ESTATE

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF GARRY W. WILLIAMS

WILLIAMS GARRY WAYNE

Defendant Attorneys

KAPLAN JONATHAN A

KAUFMAN MARK DAVID

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

8/14/2019: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for

8/14/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

8/14/2019: Minute Order

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

8/30/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

8/30/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/6/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL

9/24/2018: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

9/24/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL

9/24/2018: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL

EDWIN CORTES AND AGUENDA CORTES' ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF, JODY NOOGER

9/24/2018: EDWIN CORTES AND AGUENDA CORTES' ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF, JODY NOOGER

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

9/24/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

PROOFS OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND CROSS COMPLAINT

8/20/2018: PROOFS OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND CROSS COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/3/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Summons on Cross Complaint

8/6/2018: Summons on Cross Complaint

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR CONTRIBUTION, INDEMNITY, CONTRACTUAL INDEMNITTY AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

8/6/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR CONTRIBUTION, INDEMNITY, CONTRACTUAL INDEMNITTY AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

CIVIL DEPOSIT

8/7/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

SUMMONS

6/12/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR GENERAL NEGLIGENCE; PREMISES LIABILITY

6/12/2018: COMPLAINT FOR GENERAL NEGLIGENCE; PREMISES LIABILITY

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jody Nooger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Jody Nooger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Settlement of Entire Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of 08/14/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial (and Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees); Filed by Edwin Cortes (Defendant); Aguenda Cortes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Jody Nooger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Jonathan A Kaplan (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT FOR CONTRIBUTION, INDEMNITY, CONTRACTUAL INDEMNITTY AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Southern California Real Estate Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Southern California Real Estate Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR GENERAL NEGLIGENCE; PREMISES LIABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jody Nooger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less