This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/18/2020 at 01:25:56 (UTC).

JODY GOODENOUGH VS ANDREW P ORDON M.D. ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/28/2018 JODY GOODENOUGH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ANDREW P ORDON M D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2569

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GOODENOUGH JODY

Defendants and Respondents

THE ROXBURY CLINIC & SURGERY CENTER

ORDON ANDREW P. M.D.

DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

OSEJO JAHZEEL

KRAMER BRADLEY I

Defendant Attorneys

REINHOLTZ JACK RUSSELL

PETERSON GEORGE E.

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

10/16/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Civil Case Cover Sheet -

6/28/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet -

Complaint -

6/28/2018: Complaint -

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

12/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL)

5/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/28/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

10/28/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER MOTION FOR UNDERTAKING)

10/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER MOTION FOR UNDERTAKING)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/2/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION FOR UNDERTAKING

9/10/2019: Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION FOR UNDERTAKING

Commission to Take Deposition Outside California

9/17/2019: Commission to Take Deposition Outside California

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT ROXBURY CLINIC & SURGERY CENTER, INC'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ISSUING A COMMISSION TO TAKE A DEPOSITION OUTSIDE OF CALIFORNIA; MEMORAND

9/17/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT ROXBURY CLINIC & SURGERY CENTER, INC'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ISSUING A COMMISSION TO TAKE A DEPOSITION OUTSIDE OF CALIFORNIA; MEMORAND

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/23/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer - Defendant, Andrew P. Ordon, M.D.'s Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint

10/16/2018: Answer - Defendant, Andrew P. Ordon, M.D.'s Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint

Answer - Answer TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/17/2018: Answer - Answer TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims) - FIRST

9/19/2018: Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims) - FIRST

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -

8/9/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt -

8/9/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt -

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • Hearing07/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • Hearing07/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Hearing06/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL) of 05/01/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Jody Goodenough (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jody Goodenough (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Jody Goodenough (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Jody Goodenough (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jody Goodenough (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE ROXBURY CLINIC AND SURGERY CENTER INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REINHOLTZ JACK R. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GEORGE E. PETERSON