This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 01:41:28 (UTC).

JODI BANKS ET AL VS AMANDA BALL ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/25/2017 JODI BANKS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AMANDA BALL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9396

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANKS ALLISON

BANKS JODI

Defendants

BALL JEREMY

BALL AMANDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUSEN BRAD J. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

SHOJI KEITH L.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

7/5/2018: Unknown

DEMAND FOR JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

7/5/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

11/21/2018: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Motion in Limine

4/18/2019: Motion in Limine

Statement of the Case

4/18/2019: Statement of the Case

Motion in Limine

4/18/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

4/18/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

4/18/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

4/18/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

4/18/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

4/18/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

4/18/2019: Motion in Limine

Minute Order

4/23/2019: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM

1/11/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (PERSONAL INJURIES)

12/19/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (PERSONAL INJURIES)

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

8/30/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

8/30/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

SUMMONS

10/23/2017: SUMMONS

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine (Motion in limine no. 8); Filed by Amanda Ball (Defendant); Jeremy Ball (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketStatement of the Case; Filed by Amanda Ball (Defendant); Jeremy Ball (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine (Motion in limine no. 1); Filed by Amanda Ball (Defendant); Jeremy Ball (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine (Motion in limine no. 7); Filed by Amanda Ball (Defendant); Jeremy Ball (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine (Motion in limine no. 6); Filed by Amanda Ball (Defendant); Jeremy Ball (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine (Motion in limine no. 5); Filed by Amanda Ball (Defendant); Jeremy Ball (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine (Motion in limine no. 4); Filed by Amanda Ball (Defendant); Jeremy Ball (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jodi Banks (Plaintiff); Allison Banks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM, EX PARTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: ****9396 Hearing Date: August 23, 2021 Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JODI BANKS, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

vs.

AMANDA BALL, et al.,

Defendants.

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO.: ****9396

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

Dept. 27

8:30 a.m.

August 23, 2021

Claimant Allison Banks (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Jodi Banks (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle her claims against Defendant Amanda Ball (through State Farm Insurance) in exchange for $6,750. If approved, $1,128 will be used for medical expenses, $1,687.50 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $85.64 will be used for non-medical expenses, leaving a balance of $3,848.66 for Claimant to be deposited into a blocked account, subject to withdrawal only upon authorization of the court.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (Probate Code ;; 3500, 3600, et seq.; Civ. Proc. Code ; 372.) The Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable. Further, the requested attorney’s fees, which amounts to approximately 25% of the total settlement, is fair and reasonable. The unopposed Petition to approve minor’s compromise is GRANTED.

Per California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, Petitioner and Claimant must appear at the hearing, unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. The Court excuses Petitioner and Claimant from appearing at the hearing.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.

'


Case Number: ****9396    Hearing Date: June 23, 2020    Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JODI BANKS, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

vs.

AMANDA BALL, et al.,

Defendants.

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO.: ****9396

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

Dept. 27

1:30 p.m.

June 23, 2020

Claimant Allison Banks (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Jodi Banks (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle her claims against Defendant Amanda Ball (through State Farm Insurance) in exchange for $6,750. If approved, $1,128 will be used for medical expenses, $1,687.50 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $85.64 will be used for non-medical expenses, leaving a balance of $3,848.66 for Claimant to be deposited into a blocked account, subject to withdrawal only upon authorization of the court.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (Probate Code ;; 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc. ; 372.) The Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable. Further, the requested attorney’s fees, which amounts to approximately 25% of the total settlement, is fair and reasonable. However, the Court finds the following deficiencies in the Petition:

The unopposed Petition to approve minor’s compromise is DENIED.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.

Dated this 23rd day of June 2020

Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr.

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHOJI KEITH L.