This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 09:24:55 (UTC).

JOCELYN WILLIAMS GERMYN VS FOUR SEASONS HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER, LP

Case Summary

On 08/01/2022 JOCELYN WILLIAMS GERMYN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FOUR SEASONS HEALTHCARE WELLNESS CENTER, LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4728

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GERMYN JOCELYN WILLIAMS

Defendant

FOUR SEASONS HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AGHAEIAN ANI

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/1/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

8/1/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/1/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/1/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/4/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

10/31/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/1/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO PARTICIPATE IN THE RESOLVELAW SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM

12/15/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO PARTICIPATE IN THE RESOLVELAW SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO PARTICIPA...) OF 12/16/2022

12/16/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO PARTICIPA...) OF 12/16/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO PARTICIPA...)

12/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO PARTICIPA...)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • Hearing02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: ResolveLawLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • Hearing02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: ResolveLawLA scheduled for 02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Participa...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Participa...) of 12/16/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 02/23/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO PARTICIPATE IN THE RESOLVELAW SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM; Signed and Filed by: Four Seasons Healthcare & Wellness Center, LP (Defendant); As to: Jocelyn Williams Germyn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO PARTICIPATE IN THE RESOLVELAW SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM: Filed By: Four Seasons Healthcare & Wellness Center, LP (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jocelyn Williams Germyn (Plaintiff); As to: Four Seasons Healthcare & Wellness Center, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jocelyn Williams Germyn (Plaintiff); As to: Four Seasons Healthcare & Wellness Center, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jocelyn Williams Germyn (Plaintiff); As to: Four Seasons Healthcare & Wellness Center, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maurice A. Leiter in Department 54 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOUR SEASONS HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGHAEIAN ANI