This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2021 at 12:48:53 (UTC).

JOCELYN PORTILLO, ET AL. VS CITY OF COMPTON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 JOCELYN PORTILLO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF COMPTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7842

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PORTILLO JOCELYN

KAILY PORTILLO A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM ANA MENDEZ ALL IN THEIR INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES AND AS HEIRS AND SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST TO JOSE M PORTILLO

PORTILLO ERIKA

Defendants

MCKENZIE KIMBERLY

CITY OF COMPTON

KISHAN TENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIM SUNG SEAN

DORDICK GARY A.

Defendant Attorney

JENKINS HALEH R.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER AND RULING FROM STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION - DISCOVERY DATES]

7/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER AND RULING FROM STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION - DISCOVERY DATES]

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

6/7/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS FOR LOSS OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT FROM DECEDENT; [PROPOSED]

1/27/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS FOR LOSS OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT FROM DECEDENT; [PROPOSED]

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/19/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

Answer

11/20/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/28/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

11/5/2020: Request for Dismissal

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT CITY OF COMPTON

9/17/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT CITY OF COMPTON

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/1/2020: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

8/17/2020: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

4/23/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM RE: KAILY

4/15/2020: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM RE: KAILY

PI General Order

3/11/2020: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/25/2020: Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • Hearing02/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • Hearing01/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Hearing01/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Order and Ruling from Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC [and Related Motion - Discovery Dates]); Filed by Jocelyn Portillo (Plaintiff); Erika Portillo (Plaintiff); Kaily Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by City of Compton (Defendant); Kimberly McKenzie (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave (Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint (1st)); Filed by Jocelyn Portillo (Plaintiff); Erika Portillo (Plaintiff); Kaily Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jocelyn Portillo (Plaintiff); Erika Portillo (Plaintiff); Kaily Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (RE PLAINTIFFS? CLAIMS FOR LOSS OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT FROM DECEDENT;); Filed by City of Compton (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Jocelyn Portillo (Plaintiff); Erika Portillo (Plaintiff); Kaily Portillo a minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Ana Mendez, all in their individual capacities and as heirs and successors in interest to Jose M Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Haleh R. Jenkins Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure); Filed by City of Compton (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jocelyn Portillo (Plaintiff); Erika Portillo (Plaintiff); Kaily Portillo a minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Ana Mendez, all in their individual capacities and as heirs and successors in interest to Jose M Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Kaily Portillo a minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Ana Mendez, all in their individual capacities and as heirs and successors in interest to Jose M Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing (for Guardian ad litem re: Kaily)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jocelyn Portillo (Plaintiff); Erika Portillo (Plaintiff); Kaily Portillo a minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Ana Mendez, all in their individual capacities and as heirs and successors in interest to Jose M Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jocelyn Portillo (Plaintiff); Erika Portillo (Plaintiff); Kaily Portillo a minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Ana Mendez, all in their individual capacities and as heirs and successors in interest to Jose M Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF COMPTON is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM SUNG SEAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DORDICK GARY A. ESQ.