This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2023 at 00:13:07 (UTC).

JOCELYN JAUREGUI VS DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 JOCELYN JAUREGUI filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1201

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAUREGUI JOCELYN

Defendants

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC

MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARKS MICHAEL WILLIAM

Defendant Attorney

EDDINGS RYAN L.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/1/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/1/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/1/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/1/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/7/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/5/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/11/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

7/11/2022: Case Management Statement

General Denial

5/16/2022: General Denial

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

5/12/2022: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service

4/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Order

7/28/2022: Case Management Order

Case Management Statement

7/25/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

2/9/2023: Request for Dismissal

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 73 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketJury Trial (7 days) scheduled for 06/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 73 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jocelyn Jauregui on 04/01/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Jocelyn Jauregui as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jocelyn Jauregui (Plaintiff); As to: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant); Mission Community Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- General Denial: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- General Denial: As To Parties: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- General Denial: As To Parties: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 73

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketJury Trial (7 days) scheduled for 06/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 73

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketAddress for Michael William Parks (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Michael William Parks (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Schimmel & Parks APLC to Schimmel & Parks, APLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jocelyn Jauregui (Plaintiff); As to: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant); Mission Community Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Timothy Patrick Dillon in Department 73 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jocelyn Jauregui (Plaintiff); Mission Community Hospital (Defendant); As to: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant); Mission Community Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jocelyn Jauregui (Plaintiff); Mission Community Hospital (Defendant); As to: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less