This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/10/2019 at 04:39:52 (UTC).

JOCELYN CANDELL VS ASBET ANDREASSIAN

Case Summary

On 04/09/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by JOCELYN CANDELL against ASBET ANDREASSIAN in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1429

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CANDELL JOCELYN

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 5 0

ADREASSIAN ASBET

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 10/09/2019

10/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 10/09/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

10/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Order - Dismissal

10/9/2019: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

SUMMONS -

4/6/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. VEHICULAR NEGLIGENCE;

4/6/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. VEHICULAR NEGLIGENCE;

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Jury Trial) of 10/09/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jocelyn Candell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. VEHICULAR NEGLIGENCE;

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC701429    Hearing Date: November 06, 2019    Dept: 2

Candell v. Andreassian

Plaintiff’s Motion to Set Aside the Order for Dismissal, filed on 10/15/19, is GRANTED. The dismissal entered on 10/9/19 is vacated. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 473(b). The motion is timely made and based on the Declaration of D. Hess Panah.

If there is no prejudice, only slight evidence is needed. Doubts are resolved in favor of the party seeking relief. Mink v. Superior Court (1992) 2 Cal.App.4th 1338.

A motion for order to vacate dismissal must be filed within six months of the dismissal and show grounds of mistake, inadvertence, surprise, and excusable neglect. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 436(b).

The motion is timely made and is supported by the Declaration of D. Hess Panah, who failed to properly calendar the trial date, which supports a showing of excusable neglect. Declaration of D. Hess Panah, 6:7-11. Flores v. Board of Supervisors (1970) 13 Cal. App. 3d 480, 483.

The Court notes that there is no proof of service of the summons and complaint in the file. The Court sets an OSC re dismissal for failure to file a proof of service for April 13, 2020.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.