This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2023 at 00:08:28 (UTC).

JOCELYN AGDA-RIZKOWSKY VS RAUL AGUIRRE GUAMAN

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 JOCELYN AGDA-RIZKOWSKY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RAUL AGUIRRE GUAMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0451

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGDA-RIZKOWSKY JOCELYN FKA JOCELYN D. AGDA

Defendant

AGUIRRE GUAMAN RAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TALKOV SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

VELASCO CYNTHIA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/12/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/12/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/12/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/12/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

5/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA TO DEFENDANT'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/28/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA TO DEFENDANT'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Answer

6/16/2022: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;)

8/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;) OF 08/22/2022

8/22/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;) OF 08/22/2022

Notice of Settlement

8/22/2022: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

9/1/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/26/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department A - Hon. Salvatore Sirnaeffective 10/10/2022; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by JOCELYN AGDA-RIZKOWSKY on 05/12/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by JOCELYN AGDA-RIZKOWSKY as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: JOCELYN AGDA-RIZKOWSKY (Plaintiff); As to: JOCELYN AGDA-RIZKOWSKY (Plaintiff); RAUL AGUIRRE GUAMAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 08/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: JOCELYN AGDA-RIZKOWSKY (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No; Settlement Type: Unconditional; Set Hearing and Generate Notice?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement;) of 08/22/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Peter A. Hernandez in Department O Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JOCELYN AGDA-RIZKOWSKY (Plaintiff); As to: RAUL AGUIRRE GUAMAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JOCELYN AGDA-RIZKOWSKY (Plaintiff); As to: RAUL AGUIRRE GUAMAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JOCELYN AGDA-RIZKOWSKY (Plaintiff); As to: RAUL AGUIRRE GUAMAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JOCELYN AGDA-RIZKOWSKY (Plaintiff); As to: RAUL AGUIRRE GUAMAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less