This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2023 at 11:16:05 (UTC).

JOBE, BEVERLY A. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 12/28/2022 JOBE, BEVERLY A - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are UZCATEGUI, JESSICA A. and SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2898

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

UZCATEGUI, JESSICA A.

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners

JOBE MEREDITH S.

KADOYA GRACE

Decedent

JOBE BEVERLY A.

Not Classified By Court

BUA JOSEPH SR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

YOSHITAKE ALAN TOSHIO

 

Court Documents

Petition - Probate of Lost Will (Initial)

12/28/2022: Petition - Probate of Lost Will (Initial)

Will in Safekeeping - 22STSK02010 - 10 Pgs - Dated 07/03/2010

8/16/2022: Will in Safekeeping - 22STSK02010 - 10 Pgs - Dated 07/03/2010

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

1/4/2023: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Proof of Publication

1/17/2023: Proof of Publication

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

1/23/2023: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Minute Order

1/24/2023: Minute Order

Declaration - Declaration ISO Petition for Probate

2/3/2023: Declaration - Declaration ISO Petition for Probate

Supplement - Supplement to Petition for Probate

2/3/2023: Supplement - Supplement to Petition for Probate

Minute Order

2/6/2023: Minute Order

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

2/7/2023: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Supplement - Secon Supplement to Seventh Acct

3/20/2023: Supplement - Secon Supplement to Seventh Acct

Minute Order

3/21/2023: Minute Order

Will - Admitted

3/21/2023: Will - Admitted

Order - Probate

4/3/2023: Order - Probate

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2024
  • Hearing07/03/2024 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketOrder - Probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Uzcategui, Jessica A., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Probate of Lost Will (Initial) filed on December 28, 2022 by Meredith S. Jobe, Grace Kadoya. )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketWill (Admitted )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketSupplement (Secon Supplement to Seventh Acct ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration ISO Petition for Probate ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued - Court's own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketProof of Publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Lost Will (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketWill in Safekeeping (22STSK02010 - 10 Pgs - Dated 07/03/2010 ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less