This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2021 at 04:14:39 (UTC).

JOAQUIN SOTELO VS GEORGE L. THROOP CO., A CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 JOAQUIN SOTELO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GEORGE L THROOP CO , A CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAREN NELSON, YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS and ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0997

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAREN NELSON

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOTELO JOAQUIN

ZEPEDA ELISEO

Defendants

GEORGE L. THROOP CO. A CALIFORNIA

GEORGE L. THROOP CO.

THROOP LIGHTWEIGHT FILL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SWEENEY BRANDON J

ROWBOTHAM ANDREW JOHN

SCHMIDT FLETCHER W. H.

HAINES PAUL KEITH

Defendant Attorneys

HENLEY WILLIAM K.

BRUM PATRICIA

YU JASON T

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW J. ROWBOTHAM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

8/20/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW J. ROWBOTHAM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALMA V. MONTENEGRO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

8/20/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALMA V. MONTENEGRO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

9/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Complaint - SECOND AMENDED CLASS AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

4/2/2019: Complaint - SECOND AMENDED CLASS AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

Status Report - STATUS REPORT (JOINT)

1/13/2020: Status Report - STATUS REPORT (JOINT)

Message Board Posting - MESSAGE BOARD POSTING RE: REQUEST TO LIFT PRE-DISCOVERY STAY

12/20/2019: Message Board Posting - MESSAGE BOARD POSTING RE: REQUEST TO LIFT PRE-DISCOVERY STAY

Substitution of Attorney

10/15/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

9/18/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO FILE SECOND AMENDED CLASS AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT

8/13/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO FILE SECOND AMENDED CLASS AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASES) OF 08/27/2019

8/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASES) OF 08/27/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASES)

8/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASES)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/6/2019: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

5/21/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

5/13/2019: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

4/2/2019: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CCP 170.6 CHALLENGE)

4/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CCP 170.6 CHALLENGE)

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • Hearing09/14/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 17 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Andrew J. Rowbotham in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement); Filed by Joaquin Sotelo (Plaintiff); Eliseo Zepeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Joaquin Sotelo (Plaintiff); Eliseo Zepeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Jodey Lawrence on Behalf of Phoenix Settlement Administrators); Filed by Joaquin Sotelo (Plaintiff); Eliseo Zepeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketMotion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement; Filed by Joaquin Sotelo (Plaintiff); Eliseo Zepeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Paul K. Haines in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement); Filed by Joaquin Sotelo (Plaintiff); Eliseo Zepeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Fletcher W. Schmidt in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement); Filed by Joaquin Sotelo (Plaintiff); Eliseo Zepeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Alma V. Montenegro in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary approval of Class Action Settlement); Filed by Joaquin Sotelo (Plaintiff); Eliseo Zepeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Joaquin Sotelo in Support of Approval of Class Action settlement); Filed by Joaquin Sotelo (Plaintiff); Eliseo Zepeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Eliseo Zepeda in Support of Approval of Class Action Settlement); Filed by Joaquin Sotelo (Plaintiff); Eliseo Zepeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Docketat 11:07 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: CCP 170.6 Challenge)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re: CCP 170.6 Challenge) of 04/05/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Joaquin Sotelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joaquin Sotelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joaquin Sotelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketSecond Amended Class and Representative Action Complaint; Filed by Joaquin Sotelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEORGE L. THROOP CO. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HENLEY WILLIAM K.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRUM PATRICIA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YU JASON T