Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2021 at 08:30:48 (UTC).

JOAQUIN CUBILLO BONILLA VS HALEY MCGUIRE

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 JOAQUIN CUBILLO BONILLA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HALEY MCGUIRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1442

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CUBILLO BONILLA JOAQUIN

Defendant

MCGUIRE HALEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LANG DAVID RUSSELL

OSTROWSKI ALLYSON

NATANIAN NAVID ABRAHAM

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/21/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/24/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/28/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

4/6/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

4/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

4/7/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/25/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2024
  • Hearing03/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • Hearing09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • Hearing09/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by JOAQUIN CUBILLO BONILLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by JOAQUIN CUBILLO BONILLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JOAQUIN CUBILLO BONILLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JOAQUIN CUBILLO BONILLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOAQUIN CUBILLO BONILLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JOAQUIN CUBILLO BONILLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANG DAVID RUSSELL