This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/24/2021 at 03:20:05 (UTC).

JOAQUIN CARRERA, ET AL. VS PARK HOLDING (PHI) SERVICE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 JOAQUIN CARRERA, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PARK HOLDING PHI SERVICE, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9632

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAMIREZ JUAN

RICHIE EUNICE YVETTE

FRANCISCO ARREDONDO

CARRERA JOAQUIN

Defendants

PARK ?N FLY INC. AKA PARK ?N FLY INC. DELAWARE

PNF-LAX INC.

PARK HOLDING INC.

PARK HOLDING PHI SERVICE LLC

PARK ?N FLY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURTON ANWAR D

Defendant Attorney

NESBIT KRISTEN J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

1/19/2021: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Order

3/15/2021: Case Management Order

Case Management Statement

3/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/26/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/7/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

1/19/2021: Answer

Answer

1/19/2021: Answer

Answer

1/19/2021: Answer

Answer

1/19/2021: Answer

Answer

1/19/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

12/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/26/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/26/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • Hearing03/20/2023 at 11:30 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • Hearing03/10/2023 at 11:30 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Joaquin Carrera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by PARK HOLDING (PHI) SERVICE, LLC (Defendant); PARK ?N FLY, LLC (Defendant); PARK ?N FLY, INC. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 16; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by PARK ?N FLY, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Joaquin Carrera (Plaintiff); Juan Ramirez (Plaintiff); Arredondo Francisco (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Joaquin Carrera (Plaintiff); Juan Ramirez (Plaintiff); Arredondo Francisco (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Joaquin Carrera (Plaintiff); Juan Ramirez (Plaintiff); Arredondo Francisco (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Joaquin Carrera (Plaintiff); Juan Ramirez (Plaintiff); Arredondo Francisco (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joaquin Carrera (Plaintiff); Juan Ramirez (Plaintiff); Arredondo Francisco (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Joaquin Carrera (Plaintiff); Juan Ramirez (Plaintiff); Arredondo Francisco (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joaquin Carrera (Plaintiff); Juan Ramirez (Plaintiff); Arredondo Francisco (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PNF-LAX INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PARK 'N FLY INC. is a litigant