This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 04:55:43 (UTC).

JOANNE CADENAS VS PIA-SC INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 JOANNE CADENAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PIA-SC INSURANCE SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3543

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CADENAS JOANNE

Defendant

PIA-SC INSURANCE SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAYTON CHANTAL

Defendant Attorney

WU NATASHA M.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/15/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/14/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/9/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Answer

5/4/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/7/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/7/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

7/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

7/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

9/17/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

9/22/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2023
  • Hearing04/25/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • Hearing03/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • Hearing01/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail (Of Stipulation And Protective Order); Filed by PIA-SC INSURANCE SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER); Filed by PIA-SC INSURANCE SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by PIA-SC INSURANCE SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Joanne Cadenas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Joanne Cadenas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by PIA-SC INSURANCE SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by PIA-SC INSURANCE SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Joanne Cadenas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Joanne Cadenas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joanne Cadenas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joanne Cadenas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAYTON CHANTAL