Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2021 at 22:07:08 (UTC).

JOANNA PICO VS COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 JOANNA PICO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4310

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PICO JOANNA

Defendants

DOE 1 STORE MANAGER

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIS ANDREW

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

4/27/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Proof of Personal Service

4/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/15/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2024
  • Hearing04/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • Hearing10/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • Hearing09/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Joanna Pico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Joanna Pico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joanna Pico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Joanna Pico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joanna Pico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLIS ANDREW