This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2021 at 06:19:54 (UTC).

JOAN STRONG VS RICHARD VAN VLIET, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 JOAN STRONG filed an Other lawsuit against RICHARD VAN VLIET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0121

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STRONG JOAN

Defendants

VAN VLIET RICHARD

VAN VLIET CHRISTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS JEFFREY

DEMASON MICHELLE R.

GOWER RICHARD S.

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/15/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

9/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/26/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

8/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

Substitution of Attorney

5/21/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

5/21/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/24/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/24/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

3/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/4/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

3/25/2021: Answer - RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

Answer

4/5/2021: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

4/5/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

4/5/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/19/2021: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • Hearing10/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Joan Strong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continuance); Filed by Joan Strong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Christy Van Vliet (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Richard Van Vliet (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketResponse to Complaint; Filed by Richard Van Vliet (Defendant); Christy Van Vliet (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Joan Strong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Joan Strong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joan Strong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joan Strong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Joan Strong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joan Strong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEMASON MICHELLE R.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOWER RICHARD S.