Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/04/2021 at 19:12:13 (UTC).

JOAN RISWOLD VS SPECIALTY SURGICAL CENTER, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 JOAN RISWOLD filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against SPECIALTY SURGICAL CENTER, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8082

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RISWOLD JOAN

Defendants

MACY JONATHAN MD

SPECIALTY SURGICAL CENTER LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUNCH BRUCE MONROE

Defendant Attorneys

SLAVIN HOWARD ALLAN

PELTEKCI HELEN

AITELLI JOHN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/11/2020

6/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/11/2020

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF LODGING EXHIBITS

6/11/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF LODGING EXHIBITS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/13/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF LODGING EXHIBITS ISO OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT, CHAWLA, M.D.

9/9/2020: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF LODGING EXHIBITS ISO OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT, CHAWLA, M.D.

Separate Statement

9/9/2020: Separate Statement

Substitution of Attorney

9/23/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MAI X. NGUYEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BY DEFENDANT SPECIALTY SURGICAL CENTER, LLC

2/2/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MAI X. NGUYEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BY DEFENDANT SPECIALTY SURGICAL CENTER, LLC

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

2/18/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

3/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

3/8/2021: Notice of Settlement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF VACATION OF FSC AND TRIAL DATE AND SETTING OSC RE DISMISSAL

3/11/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF VACATION OF FSC AND TRIAL DATE AND SETTING OSC RE DISMISSAL

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL BY DEFENDANT SPECIALTY SURGICAL CENTER, LLC

1/2/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL BY DEFENDANT SPECIALTY SURGICAL CENTER, LLC

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.254 BY DEFENDANT SPECIALTY SURGICAL CENTER, LLC

1/2/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.254 BY DEFENDANT SPECIALTY SURGICAL CENTER, LLC

Answer

1/2/2020: Answer

Answer

12/5/2019: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/5/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

12/9/2019: Proof of Personal Service

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Joan Riswold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Specialty Surgical Center, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Joan Riswold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Order to Show Cause re Dismissal); Filed by Joan Riswold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Vacation of Fsc and Trial Date and Setting Osc Re Dismissal); Filed by Jonathan Macy, MD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Docketat 1:43 PM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Joan Riswold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Joan Riswold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jonathan Macy, MD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jonathan Macy, MD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Joan Riswold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joan Riswold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joan Riswold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPECIALTY SURGICAL CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUNCH, BRUCE M