This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/13/2023 at 17:57:13 (UTC).

JOAN CORNELIUS VS CITY OF WEST COVINA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 JOAN CORNELIUS filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF WEST COVINA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES C. LEE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4451

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHARLES C. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORNELIUS JOAN

Defendants

CITY OF SAN DIMAS

CITY OF WEST COVINA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHONEY PAUL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

7/12/2021: Request for Dismissal

PI General Order

7/9/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Joan Cornelius on 07/01/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Joan Cornelius as to County of Los Angeles, City of West Covina, and City of San Dimas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docket** Case Name changed from JOAN CORNELIUS vs COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, et al. to JOAN CORNELIUS vs CITY OF WEST COVINA, et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Joan Cornelius (Plaintiff); As to: County of Los Angeles (Defendant); City of West Covina (Defendant); City of San Dimas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Joan Cornelius (Plaintiff); As to: County of Los Angeles (Defendant); City of West Covina (Defendant); City of San Dimas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Joan Cornelius (Plaintiff); As to: County of Los Angeles (Defendant); City of West Covina (Defendant); City of San Dimas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less