This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2021 at 15:46:15 (UTC).

JOAN CORNELIUS VS CITY OF WEST COVINA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 JOAN CORNELIUS filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF WEST COVINA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4451

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORNELIUS JOAN

Defendants

CITY OF SAN DIMAS

CITY OF WEST COVINA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHONEY PAUL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

7/12/2021: Request for Dismissal

PI General Order

7/9/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Joan Cornelius (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joan Cornelius (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Joan Cornelius (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joan Cornelius (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less