This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 15:31:41 (UTC).

JOAN AOKI FREEMAN VS TERI CASEY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/03/2019 JOAN AOKI FREEMAN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against TERI CASEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9150

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREEMAN JOAN AOKI

Defendants

CAROLYN HYATT TRUSTEE OF THE CAROLYN HYATT TRUST

HYATT CAROLYN

TERI CASEY SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE CAROLYN HYATT TRUST

CASEY TERI

CITY OF GARDENA

SUNRUN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINCHELL STERLING

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/25/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/13/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/13/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Lis Pendens

6/14/2019: Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/14/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons

6/3/2019: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/3/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/3/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by JOAN AOKI FREEMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by JOAN AOKI FREEMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by JOAN AOKI FREEMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by JOAN AOKI FREEMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by JOAN AOKI FREEMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOAN AOKI FREEMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUNRUN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF GARDENA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINCHELL STERLING SCOTT ESQ.