This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 04:30:30 (UTC).

JMS AIR CONDITIONING AND APPLIANCE SERVICE INC VS BERNARDS

Case Summary

On 12/01/2017 JMS AIR CONDITIONING AND APPLIANCE SERVICE INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BERNARDS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5363

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

JMS AIR CONDITIONING AND APPLIANCE

JMS A/C & HEATING

JMS AIR CONDITIONING AND APLLIANCE DBA JMS A/C & HEATING

Defendants and Respondents

BERNARDS BROS. INC

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

DOES 1 TO 30

BERNARDS BROS. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

PITRE RANDALL J. ESQ.

PITRE RANDALL JOHN ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

GROPMAN TED R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

2/9/2018: Unknown

Unknown

2/9/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

2/20/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/30/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/31/2019: Minute Order

Status Report

4/4/2019: Status Report

Minute Order

4/10/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/3/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

12/22/2017: Unknown

SUMMONS

12/1/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; COMMON COUNTS; FOR RECOVERY ON PAYMENT BOND

12/1/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; COMMON COUNTS; FOR RECOVERY ON PAYMENT BOND

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Status Report; Filed by JMS Air Conditioning and Aplliance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Minute Order ((Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 12; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-02-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by JMS Air Conditioning and Aplliance (Plaintiff); JMS A/C & HEATING (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 12; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-01-03 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by Bernards Bros. Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; COMMON COUNTS; FOR RECOVERY ON PAYMENT BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by JMS Air Conditioning and Aplliance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JMS A/C & HEATING is a litigant

Latest cases where JMS AIR CONDITIONING & APPLIANCE SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases where BERNARDS BROS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant