This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 21:32:22 (UTC).

JMG LOS ANGELES, LLC VS REX NGUYEN RESTORATIONS, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 JMG LOS ANGELES, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against REX NGUYEN RESTORATIONS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1605

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JMG LOS ANGELES LLC

Defendant

REX NGUYEN RESTORATIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLOYD HARRY E.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

10/1/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (REX NGUYEN RESTORATIONS, LLC)

10/1/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (REX NGUYEN RESTORATIONS, LLC)

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

9/30/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/30/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • Hearing03/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((REX NGUYEN RESTORATIONS, LLC)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JMG LOS ANGELES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JMG LOS ANGELES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JMG LOS ANGELES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by JMG LOS ANGELES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REX NGUYEN RESTORATIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELLER & FLOYD - HARRY E. FLOYD ESQ