This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2019 at 00:42:22 (UTC).

JM STORY INC VS BRIAN MOON ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/17/2017 JM STORY INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRIAN MOON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RITA MILLER and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8778

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RITA MILLER

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JM STORY INC

Defendants and Respondents

MOON UP IN THE SKY INC

BLACK COLLECTION

MIRACLE BERRY

DOES 1 TO 50

MOON BRIAN

BERRY MIRACLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MANN JEFF A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/2/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/2/2018: Minute Order

SUMMARY IDENTIFYING PARTIES AND NATURE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1800

4/3/2018: SUMMARY IDENTIFYING PARTIES AND NATURE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1800

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE RE SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

4/3/2018: DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE RE SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

JUDGMENT

4/3/2018: JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF JAE GU YEO, CEO OF JM STORY INC. PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURES SECTION 585(D)

4/3/2018: DECLARATION OF JAE GU YEO, CEO OF JM STORY INC. PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURES SECTION 585(D)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/3/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/3/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/3/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

1/9/2019: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

5/15/2019: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

9/20/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

9/20/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Unknown

11/15/2017: Unknown

COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

7/17/2017: COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/27/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/27/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/2/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by JM Story Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by JM Story Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Default Judgment; Filed by JM Story Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • SUMMARY IDENTIFYING PARTIES I AND NATURE OF PLAINTIFF S CLAIM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1800

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by JM Story Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JM Story, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MOON UP IN THE SKY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANN JEFF A.