This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2021 at 00:47:48 (UTC).

JJH SOLUTIONS GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS THE DUTRA GROUP, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 JJH SOLUTIONS GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE DUTRA GROUP, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK C. KIM. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0077

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JJH SOLUTIONS GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA HERMOSA INFRASTRUCTURE MATERIALS

Defendants

HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA A NEW HAMPSHIRE CORPORATION

CITY OF LONG BEACH A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

THE DUTRA GROUP A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PINNER CONSTRUCTION CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

YASUDA MARSHA M.

KELLAM NEWTON W

Other Attorneys

PLUMTREE A. MARIA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

2/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/17/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/16/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service

2/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/25/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/25/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

4/7/2021: Answer

Answer

4/13/2021: Answer

Answer

4/13/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

7/6/2021: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by JJH Solutions Group, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Pinner Construction Co., Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company, a Connecticut corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Long Beach, a municipal corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by JJH Solutions Group, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by JJH Solutions Group, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JJH Solutions Group, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JJH Solutions Group, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JJH Solutions Group, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JJH Solutions Group, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JJH Solutions Group, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JJH Solutions Group, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE DUTRA GROUP A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PINNER CONSTRUCTION CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF LONG BEACH is a litigant