This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 06:43:02 (UTC).

JIRAIR MAKARADE VS NAEIRI DEHBASHIANHAZARJARIBI

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 JIRAIR MAKARADE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NAEIRI DEHBASHIANHAZARJARIBI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4529

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAKARADE JIRAIR

Defendants

DEHBASHIANHAZARJARIBI NAEIRI

SAFARI YRMINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOOKASIAN ARTIN

Defendant Attorney

RICKETT REBECCA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/2/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

7/12/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

7/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/25/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/25/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

General Denial

8/25/2021: General Denial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/20/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2024
  • Hearing06/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • Hearing12/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • Hearing12/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by JIRAIR MAKARADE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by NAEIRI DEHBASHIANHAZARJARIBI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by NAEIRI DEHBASHIANHAZARJARIBI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by JIRAIR MAKARADE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by JIRAIR MAKARADE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JIRAIR MAKARADE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JIRAIR MAKARADE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JIRAIR MAKARADE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOOKASIAN ARTIN