This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/28/2021 at 05:51:53 (UTC).

JINGXI ZHU VS ANGEL JIMENEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 JINGXI ZHU filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANGEL JIMENEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2597

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZHU JINGXI

Defendants

ZEREP MANAGEMENT CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

VALLEY VISTA SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

JIMENEZ ANGEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER ELEANOR L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

4/13/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/1/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2024
  • Hearing03/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • Hearing09/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • Hearing09/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jingxi Zhu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jingxi Zhu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jingxi Zhu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZEREP MANAGEMENT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where VALLEY VISTA SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER ELEANOR L.