This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2020 at 08:51:04 (UTC).

JINGJING GUO VS HONGYU REN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 JINGJING GUO filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against HONGYU REN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4777

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUO JINGJING

Defendants

PACIFIC CULTURE ENTERPRISE INC.

YOU JIANG

SHUM KUNG

REN HONGYU

ASIA-PACIFIC CALIFORNIA INC.

YA ZHOU WEN HUA ENTERPRISES LTD. INC.

SHU LAN

RHYTHM MEDIA GROUP INC.

Not Classified By Court

NOTE WE ARE APPEARING FOR SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT JINGJING GUO

LUKE EMERSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAGLE MARK JOSEPH

Defendant Attorneys

CARPENTER SCOTT ROCKWELL

LISTER JOHN

WALKER JOSEPH ARTHUR

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - HEARING RE: DISMISSAL DATE)

3/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - HEARING RE: DISMISSAL DATE)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/31/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/31/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

11/5/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/23/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

9/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

10/2/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Notice - NOTICE REQUEST FOR ORAL TESTIMONY AT PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING

6/27/2019: Notice - NOTICE REQUEST FOR ORAL TESTIMONY AT PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING

Objection - OBJECTION TO LATE SERVED DOCUMENTS

7/3/2019: Objection - OBJECTION TO LATE SERVED DOCUMENTS

Answer - ANSWER OF NOMINAL RHYTHM MEDIA GROUP, INC.

6/17/2019: Answer - ANSWER OF NOMINAL RHYTHM MEDIA GROUP, INC.

Answer

6/17/2019: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING DAT...)

5/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING DAT...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DECLARATION OF MARK J. NAGLE; EXHIBITS

5/16/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DECLARATION OF MARK J. NAGLE; EXHIBITS

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/15/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/14/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/14/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/29/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jingjing Guo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: ( why sanctions (including monetary sanctions of at least $500 and/or dismissal) should not be imposed for failure to cause entry of default as to all served defendants who have not appeared) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (Motion for Order to Compel Shareholder Meeting per Corporations Code Section 305)

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jingjing Guo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jingjing Guo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CONDITIONALLY FILING UNDER SEAL); Filed by Jingjing Guo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketMotion re: ([PUBLIC - REDACTS MATERIALS FROM CONDITIONALLY SEALED RECORDS] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DECLARATION OF MARK J. NAGLE; EXHIBITS); Filed by Jingjing Guo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DECLARATION OF MARK J. NAGLE; EXHIBITS); Filed by Jingjing Guo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jingjing Guo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jingjing Guo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jingjing Guo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jingjing Guo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASIA-PACIFIC CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAGLE MARK J.