This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 18:02:29 (UTC).

JIMMY HERARD VS RIDWAN WIRYO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2022 JIMMY HERARD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RIDWAN WIRYO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7328

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERARD JIMMY

Defendants

FLORES ALEX

LYFT INC.

WIRYO RIDWAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROCK CAMERON Y.

Defendant Attorneys

MARCUS KIMBERLY

OBERRECHT KIMBERLY

SELLERS RYAN M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

4/13/2022: Notice of Related Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 05/19/2022

5/19/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 05/19/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

5/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Notice of Ruling

5/25/2022: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/25/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

4/7/2022: Answer

Answer

4/11/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

4/13/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/22/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/22/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

3/1/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/1/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/1/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/1/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2025
  • Hearing02/25/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • Hearing08/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • Hearing08/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Ridwan Wiryo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Ridwan Wiryo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case) of 05/19/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Ridwan Wiryo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Ridwan Wiryo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jimmy Herard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jimmy Herard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jimmy Herard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lyft, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROCK CAMERON Y